Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ugo de Scuria, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jun 1351AppointedArchbishop of Colosses {Rhodes}, Greece
15 Dec 1361AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
12 Jul 1370AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ostuni, Italy
1374¹DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ugo de Scuria
Archbishop Ugo de Scuria O.F.M. (died 1374) Bishop of Ostuni

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 411, and Page 381
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast