Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Scroope

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1464AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 1464Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
10 May 1468DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Scroope
Bishop Richard Scroope (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYork, Archdiocese of York, England

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 170
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1464, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,704

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast