Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Schemmer, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1874Born
1894²19.6First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1895²20.6Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1 Apr 189924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Nov 190834.5AppointedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
17 Dec 190935.6ResignedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
5 Mar 191237.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Schemmer
Father Joseph Schemmer O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLüdinghausen, Germany
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMuralto, Switzerland

  • a priest for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge, 2,017, 5, 6
  • b: CB, 22 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast