Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basile Chahiat (Schajat)

Deceased

Bishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1834AppointedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
19 May 1836Ordained BishopBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
1864²DiedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basile Chahiat (Schajat)
Bishop Basile Chahiat (Schajat) (died 1864) Bishop of Zahleh e Furzol

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damas

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,995
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast