Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rinaldo Scarlicchio

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1621AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
14 Aug 1622Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
13 Nov 1630AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
1641²DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Scarlicchio
Bishop Rinaldo Scarlicchio (died 1641) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTrieste, Diocese of Trieste, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast