Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Scammell

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1284SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
22 Oct 1284Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 1286DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Scammell
Bishop Walter Scammell (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSon

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 597
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast