Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Scaglione, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1623Born
28 May 163916.2ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
6 Jun 167855.2AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
26 Jun 167855.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Jul 168057.3DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Scaglione
Bishop Salvatore Scaglione O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeano
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,659

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast