Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of S. Barbara

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1143AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
20 Jun 1143Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
24 Nov 1152DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of S. Barbara
Bishop William of S. Barbara (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWinchester, Diocese of Winchester, England

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 46
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast