Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Louis de Savoie, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Administrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1456AppointedAdministrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
16 Feb 1460AppointedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
4 Jul 1482DiedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis de Savoie
Father Jean Louis de Savoie O.F.M. (died ) Administrator of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 158, and Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast