Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dominco Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1792Born
7 Mar 185360.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 185360.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
30 Aug 186471.9DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Dominco Savelli
Dominco Cardinal Savelli (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpeloncato, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast