Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Savage

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1463Born
3 Dec 149229.9AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
28 Apr 149330.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
3 Aug 149633.5AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 150138.0AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
3 Sep 150744.6DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Savage
Archbishop Thomas Savage (born 1463, died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 298, and Page 568
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180, and Page 224
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1493, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast