Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Saarbrücken

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jul 1404AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
21 Sep 1404Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
10 Jan 1420AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
30 Nov 1438DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Saarbrücken
Bishop Jean de Saarbrücken (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 531, and Page 175
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,926
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast