Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Romeo Sombilon Saniel, O.M.I.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Jolo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1958 Born
21 May 197920.9First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 Dec 198527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Dec 201860.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jolo, Philippines
30 Jan 201960.6InstalledApostolic Administrator of Jolo, Philippines
28 May 202061.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Jolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Romeo Sombilon Saniel
Father Romeo Sombilon Saniel O.M.I. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Jolo

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Jolo.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 9 Jan 2019
  • mn: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast