Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eleazario Cardinal da Sabran

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1330¹Born
5 Sep 137343.6AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
1378²48.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
18 Sep 137848.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
18 Sep 137848.7Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 1381¹51.6DiedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eleazario da Sabran
Eleazario Cardinal da Sabran (born 1330, died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriano
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast