Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Kurz (Kurtino)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1526AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
14 Mar 1526AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
21 Jul 1557DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Kurz (Kurtino)
Bishop Heinrich Kurz (Kurtino) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegensburg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 166, and Page 346
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: CB, 16 Jun 2018
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast