Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Russell

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629²Born
7 Jun 165425.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dublin, Ireland
7 Jun 165425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
2 Aug 168354.5AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
24 Jul 169263.5DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Russell
Archbishop Patrick Russell (born 1629, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained DeaconLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained PriestLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 38.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 188
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 32
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 116, and Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast