Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Ruspoli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1697Born
2 Oct 173032.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Nov 173033.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
21 May 174143.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Ruspoli
Bartolomeo Cardinal Ruspoli (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast