Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ruiz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of ┴vila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1476¹Born
18 Nov 150933.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
14 Jul 151438.5AppointedBishop of ┴vila, Spain
23 Oct 152852.8DiedBishop of ┴vila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ruiz
Bishop Francisco Ruiz O.F.M. (born 1476, died ) Bishop of ┴vila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 26, Number 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1509, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast