Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gregorio de Rojas y Velázquez

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1644Born
3 Jun 169753.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
25 Aug 169753.5Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
7 Apr 170460.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
24 Nov 170965.8DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Gregorio de Rojas y Velázquez
Bishop José Gregorio de Rojas y Velázquez (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranda de Duero, Diocese of Osma
Ordained BishopPalazuelo

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240, and Page 316
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 239, Number 1,483
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 42
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,328
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast