Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luca Cardinal Rodolfucci de Gentili

Deceased

Administrator of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
24 Dec 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
18 Sep 1378AppointedAdministrator of Nocera Umbra, Italy
18 Sep 1378Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 1378AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
18 Jan 1389DiedAdministrator of Nocera Umbra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Rodolfucci de Gentili
Luca Cardinal Rodolfucci de Gentili (died ) Administrator of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Diocese of Camerino
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Ancona, Diocese of Ancona
Death PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Camerino, Diocese of Camerino

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 373
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,849
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Jul 2021

Quantcast