Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Rinal

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1246AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Aug 1247AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
18 Dec 1257AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
2 Oct 1259DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Rinal
Bishop Mateo Rinal (died ) Bishop of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151, and Page 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Apr 2021

Quantcast