Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateEventTitle
1513¹AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
1513¹AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
3 Jul 1513Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
28 Mar 1528DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard
Bishop Richard (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Thomas d'Acre, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 344
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Feb 2016
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast