Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo Ribeiro, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659¹Born
3 Jun 169132.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
5 Dec 170142.9AppointedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
29 Jul 170344.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
24 Jan 171657.0DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Ribeiro
Archbishop Joćo Ribeiro S.J. (born 1659, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceAmbalucatta

  • a bishop for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,814
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 21
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast