Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Benedikt (Johannes) Reetz, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Abbot President of the Beuron Congregation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1897Born
5 Jul 192124.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Sep 192427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jul 195760.3AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Aug 195760.4InstalledAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Dec 196467.7DiedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Benedikt (Johannes) Reetz (VIAF: 54141356)
Abbot Benedikt (Johannes) Reetz O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRipsdorf, Germany
Death Placenear Beuron

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast