Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond , O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1320AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
6 Sep 1328AppointedBishop of Vence, France
10 Jan 1334AppointedBishop of Nice, France
1335²DiedBishop of Nice, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymond
Bishop Raymond O.F.M. (died 1335) Bishop of Nice

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 519, and Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 528

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast