Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Ravat, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1395AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
29 Mar 1398AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
18 Sep 1405AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
22 Sep 1408Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 1408AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
9 Jul 1409ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
Apr 1417²DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Ravat
Archbishop Pierre Ravat C.R.S.A. (died Apr 1417) Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamiers, Diocese of Pamiers
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Buried Place (Original)Santa Eulalia Chapel, Cathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a cardinal for 8.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488, and Page 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 331
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast