Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Mercatel, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1487AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
16 Feb 1487AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
8 Jul 1487Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
3 Aug 1508DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Raphael Mercatel
Bishop Raphael Mercatel O.S.B. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBruges, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceBruges, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1487, Number 6
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,462
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast