Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Secondo Radicati de Cocconato

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1671Born
21 Nov 170029.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Casale Monferrato, Italy
12 Dec 170029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
9 May 170130.1AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
22 May 170130.2Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
12 Apr 172857.0AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
1 Dec 172958.7DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Secondo Radicati de Cocconato
Bishop Pier Secondo Radicati de Cocconato (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCella Monte, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopGes¨, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Osimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 108, and Page 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1701, Number 27
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast