Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pilfort Cardinal de Rabastens, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jan 1312AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of León, Spain
19 Oct 1317AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
20 Dec 1320AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
20 Dec 1320Elevated to Cardinal
1330¹DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pilfort de Rabastens
Pilfort Cardinal de Rabastens O.S.B. (died 1330) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Géry, Château, Rabastens

  • a cardinal for 9.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421, and Page 94
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 299, and Page 300
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast