Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Quinn

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1728²Born
26 Mar 175729.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 177951.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
17 Aug 177951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
Nov 1786³58.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Quinn
Bishop Simon Quinn (born 1728, died Nov 1786) Coadjutor Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleville, County Cork
Buried Place (Original)Ballynoe

  • a priest for 29.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 197, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 42
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast