Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gerolamo Querini, O.P. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Oct 1524AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Jan 1525Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
19 Aug 1554DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Querini
Patriarch Gerolamo Querini O.P. (died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Church, Castello

  • a bishop for 29.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 1
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast