Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Querini

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1275AppointedBishop of Castello, Italy
17 Jun 1286AppointedAdministrator of Chioggia, Italy
11 Jan 1287ResignedAdministrator of Chioggia, Italy
8 Jan 1303AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
10 Jan 1304AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 Apr 1307DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Querini
Bishop Bartolomeo Querini (died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Diocese of Castello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 171, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 498, and Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Aug 2021

Quantcast