Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Giuseppe Gaetano Felice Quandel, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Montecassino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1833Born
26 Dec 186532.3Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Mar 187036.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 May 187440.7Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1896²62.3SelectedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
28 Jun 189662.8ConfirmedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
27 Feb 189763.5DiedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gaetano Felice Quandel (VIAF: 185152742890727730081)
Abbot Giuseppe Gaetano Felice Quandel O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Montecassino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceMontecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Buried Place (Original)Montecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino

  • a priest for 26.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast