Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas di Puppio (di Jarente)

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1382AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
2 Mar 1388AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
22 Dec 1396AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
10 Feb 1420DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Thomas di Puppio (di Jarente)
Archbishop Thomas di Puppio (di Jarente) (died ) Archbishop of Aix

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 267, and Page 508
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast