Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Provana

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
21 Jul 162244.5AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
17 Sep 162345.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
19 Jan 163254.0AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
25 Jul 164062.5DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Provana
Archbishop Antonio Provana (born 1578, died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329, and Page 179
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 30
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast