Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berenguer Prat

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1316AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
5 Dec 1316Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
19 Feb 1340DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer Prat
Bishop Berenguer Prat (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 223
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 301, Number 136
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,956

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast