Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Portugal

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹Born
14 May 163635.3AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
24 Aug 163635.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
13 Jan 1644³43.0DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Portugal
Bishop Miguel de Portugal (born 1601, died ) Bishop of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÉvora, Archdiocese of Évora
Ordained BishopHoly Sacrament, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 17
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast