Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Afonso Cardinal de Portugal

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1509Born
9 Sep 15167.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
1 Jul 15178.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 15199.8AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
20 Feb 152313.8AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 Feb 152313.8AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
6 Jul 152516.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
13 Aug 153526.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
16 Apr 154030.9DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Afonso de Portugal
Afonso Cardinal de Portugal (born , died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÉvora, Diocese of Évora
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a cardinal for 22.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1516, Number 17*
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast