Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pisculli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
17 Sep 160745.7AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
30 Sep 160745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
Jun 1618³56.4DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pisculli
Bishop Giuseppe Pisculli O.F.M. Conv. (born 1562, died Jun 1618) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelfi, Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
Ordained BishopDodici Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCatanzaro, Diocese of Catanzaro

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 37
  • b/c2: CB, 19 May 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,383
  • c34: AT, 24 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast