Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pio Vito Pinto

Dean Emeritus of the Roman Rota

Priest of Avellino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1941 Born
8 Sep 196726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Avellino, Italy
22 Sep 201271.4AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
29 Mar 202180.0RetiredDean of the Roman Rota

MicroData Summary for Pio Vito Pinto (VIAF: 50843029)
Father Pio Vito Pinto (born ) Dean Emeritus of Roman Rota

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoci, Archdiocese of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Please contact the Father through the Roman Rota.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2012
  • op: CB, 25 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 May 2021

Quantcast