Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1388AppointedBishop of Civitate (Cittą or Civita), Italy
11 Jul 1401AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
12 Mar 1410DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro
Bishop Pietro (died ) Bishop of Larino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 294, and Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast