Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father André Peyralbe, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1825Born
5 Nov 185227.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
2 Jun 185529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1868²42.1AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
1869²43.1ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
18 Feb 187246.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Peyralbe
Father André Peyralbe C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Honan {Ho-Nan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChalvignac, France
Death PlaceSaint-Flour, Diocese of Saint-Flour, France

  • a priest for 16.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast