Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Peynel (Paganelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1353AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
19 Nov 1354AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
23 Feb 1366DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Robert de Peynel (Paganelli)
Bishop Robert de Peynel (Paganelli) (died ) Bishop of Nantes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494, and Page 355
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast