Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Luigi Maria Perego, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1864Born
15 Oct 192864.4AppointedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
194681.6ResignedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
28 Jan 194782.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Perego
Abbot Luigi Maria Perego O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcore

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast