Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Pelagio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1332AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
9 Jun 1333AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
25 Jan 1350DiedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Pelagio
Bishop Alvaro Pelagio O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Silves (Sylves)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452, and Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast