Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pelagius I

Pelagio

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
505¹Born
544²39.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon
544²39.0Elevated to Cardinal
556¹51.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Apr 55651.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Mar 56156.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pelagio
Pope Pelagio (born 505, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 544
  • c23: ATh, 13 Oct 2018
  • c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast