Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Payne, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1483AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
4 Aug 1483³Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
3 Mar 1506DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Payne
Bishop John Payne O.P. (died ) Bishop of Meath

  • a bishop for 22.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 191
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast