Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pandolfo

Deceased

Archbishop

Administrator of Ancona

Bishop of Patti e Lipari


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1286AppointedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy
4 Jul 1290AppointedAdministrator of Torres, Italy
26 Feb 1296AppointedAdministrator of Ancona, Italy
1299¹DiedBishop of Patti e Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pandolfo
Archbishop Pandolfo (died 1299) Archbishop

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 504, and Page 87
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast