Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pierre de Palude, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Administrator of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1329AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
14 Jul 1335AppointedAdministrator of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
17 Jul 1336AppointedAdministrator of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
1337¹ResignedAdministrator of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
31 Jan 1342DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Palude
Patriarch Pierre de Palude O.P. (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 276, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 367
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast