Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Pallotta

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1770Born
10 Mar 182353.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182353.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
1833²62.8AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
19 Jul 183464.4DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pallotta (VIAF: 71199871)
Antonio Cardinal Pallotta (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldarola, Archdiocese of Ferrara, Italy
Death PlaceMonte Cassiano, Diocese of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Silvestro in Capite, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast